US SB2648 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-06 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-06 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009 to reauthorize the Kenai Mountains-Turnagain Arm National Heritage Area in the State of Alaska, and for other purposes.
Title
Kenai Mountains-Turnagain Arm National Heritage Area Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3425 (Related) 2021-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3435 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 230.
SB3435 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 230.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2648/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2648/BILLS-117s2648is.pdf |