US SB2639 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows residents who are not already eligible for Medicaid and not concurrently enrolled in other health insurance coverage to buy into a state Medicaid plan beginning January 1, 2022, at the option of the state. State Medicaid programs may set premiums and cost-sharing requirements for such coverage in accordance with specified limitations. The bill also (1) provides the enhanced Federal Medical Assistance Percentage (i.e., federal matching rate) to every state that expands Medicaid coverage for individuals who are newly eligible under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, regardless of when such expansion takes place; and (2) requires state Medicaid programs to cover comprehensive reproductive health care services, including abortion services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Public Option Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB4974 (Same As) 2021-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB340 (Related) 2021-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback