US SB2639 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Restoring Integrity to America's Elections Act This bill revises provisions regarding the Federal Election Commission (FEC), including to change FEC membership. The bill reduces the number of members of the FEC from eight to five, including by removing the Secretary of the Senate and Clerk of the House as ex officio members. No more than two members may be affiliated with the same political party. A Blue Ribbon Advisory Panel shall recommend to the President individuals for nomination to the FEC. The President shall appoint the FEC chair, subject to Senate confirmation. The bill distributes the FEC's powers between the chair and the other FEC members. The bill modifies the process for (1) the FEC to initiate an investigation, and (2) a party aggrieved by the FEC's dismissal of the party's complaint or the FEC's failure to take action on the party's complaint. Persons who submit written comments regarding requests for advisory opinions must be given an opportunity to appear at FEC hearings on such requests. The FEC's administrative penalty authority is extended permanently. FEC forms must allow for the use of an accent mark as part of a person's identification. The bill provides statutory authority for limitations on ex parte communications as applied to FEC members and employees. The bill specifies that FEC attorneys may represent the FEC before the Supreme Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restoring Integrity to America's Elections Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Same As/Similar To

HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1272 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback