US SB2638 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-190. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-190. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires small hub airports to maintain a lactation area for nursing mothers and a baby changing table in at least one men's and one women's restroom in each passenger terminal building of the airport. Currently, medium and large hub airports must comply with this requirement by FY2021. The bill requires small hub airports to be in compliance by FY2023.
Title
Friendly Airports for Mothers Improvement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-190. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-10-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-10-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5188) |
2020-10-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2638. |
2020-10-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5188-5189) |
2020-10-01 | House | Mr. Carbajal moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-07-30 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-07-30 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4596-4597; text: CR S4596-4597) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 479. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-232. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3362 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate.