US SB2635 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime and Terrorism. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime and Terrorism. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ending the Fentanyl Crisis Act of 2018
Title
Ending the Fentanyl Crisis Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime and Terrorism. Hearings held. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1354 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5459 (Same As) 2018-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB5459 (Same As) 2018-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Postal service
Trade restrictions
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Postal service
Trade restrictions
U.S. Sentencing Commission
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2635/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2635/BILLS-115s2635is.pdf |