US SB2624 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize major medical facility projects for the Department of Veterans Affairs for fiscal year 2022, and for other purposes.
Title
Fiscal Year 2022 Veterans Affairs Major Medical Facility Authorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7500 (Same As) 2022-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-190.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2624/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2624/BILLS-117s2624is.pdf |