US SB2624 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Afghan Allies Protection Act of 2014 - Amends the Afghan Allies Protection Act of 2009 to: (1) increase to 4,000 the number of Afghan special immigrant visas available in FY2014, and (2) extend unused visa carryover authority through December 31, 2016.
Title
Afghan Allies Protection Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4594 (Related) 2014-07-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
SB2302 (Related) 2014-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5195 (Related) 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-160.
SB2302 (Related) 2014-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5195 (Related) 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-160.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2624/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2624/BILLS-113s2624is.pdf |