US SB2610 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-10 - By Senator Warner from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 117-37. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-10 - By Senator Warner from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 117-37. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An original bill to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2022 for intelligence and intelligence-related activities of the United States Government, the Intelligence Community Management Account, and the Central Intelligence Agency Retirement and Disability System, and for other purposes.
Title
Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-10 | Senate | By Senator Warner from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 117-37. Additional views filed. |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 116. |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Select Committee on Intelligence. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Warner. Without written report. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1297 (Related) 2021-05-25 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
SB407 (Related) 2022-06-15 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB2543 (Related) 2021-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB407 (Related) 2022-06-15 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB2543 (Related) 2021-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2610/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2610/BILLS-117s2610pcs.pdf |