US SB2607 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-320.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-320.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal to the former hostages of the Iran Hostage Crisis of 1979-1981, highlighting their resilience throughout the unprecedented ordeal that they lived through and the national unity it produced, marking 4 decades since their 444 days in captivity, and recognizing their sacrifice to the United States.
Title
Iran Hostages Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-320. |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-23 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9815-9816) |
2022-12-14 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed debate on S. 2607. |
2022-12-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2607. |
2022-12-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9815-9817) |
2022-12-14 | House | Mr. Auchincloss moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-12-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7004; text: CR S7004-7005) |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1179 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.