US SB2607 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 652.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 652.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DIGIT Act Developing Innovation and Growing the Internet of Things Act (Sec. 2) This bill expresses the sense of Congress that policies governing the Internet of Things (IoT) should maximize the potential and development of the growing number of connected and interconnected devices to benefit businesses, governments, and consumers. (Sec. 4) The bill requires the Department of Commerce to convene a working group of federal stakeholders to provide recommendations and a report to Congress regarding the IoT. The bill establishes a steering committee to be composed of stakeholders outside the federal government to advise the working group. The working group must: (1) identify federal laws and regulations, grant practices, budgetary or jurisdictional challenges, and other sector-specific policies that inhibit IoT development; (2) consider policies or programs that encourage and improve coordination among federal agencies with IoT jurisdiction; (3) implement recommendations from the steering committee; (4) examine how federal agencies can benefit from, use, and prepare for the IoT; and (5) consult with nongovernmental stakeholders. The steering committee must advise the working group about laws, budgets, spectrum needs, individual privacy, security, small business challenges, and any international proceedings or negotiations affecting the IoT. Within 18 months after enactment of this bill, the working group must report its findings and recommendations, its reasons for inaction on steering committee recommendations, and an accounting of any progress by federal agencies to implement recommendations. (Sec. 5) The Federal Communications Commission must: (1) seek public comment on the IoT's spectrum needs, regulatory barriers, and growth with licensed and unlicensed spectrum; and (2) submit a summary of those comments to Congress.
Title
DIGIT Act Developing Innovation and Growing the Internet of Things Act
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 652. |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 114-364. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5117 (Related) 2016-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Computer security and identity theft
Digital media
Internet and video services
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment
Advisory bodies
Computer security and identity theft
Digital media
Internet and video services
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment