US SB2601 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BIG Data for IP Act Building Innovation Growth through Data for Intellectual Property Act This bill amends the Leahy-Smith America Invents Act to extend for 10 years the authority of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office to set and adjust patent fees.
Title
BIG Data for IP Act Building Innovation Growth through Data for Intellectual Property Act
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5887 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB3416 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3416 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Commerce
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Intellectual property
User charges and fees
Commerce
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Intellectual property
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2601/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2601/BILLS-115s2601is.pdf |