US SB2561 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 549.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 549.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Forest and Rangeland Renewable Resources Planning Act of 1974 and the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 to provide that a land resource management plan or land use plan approved, amended, or revised under those Acts shall not be considered to be a continuing Federal agency action or constitute a discretionary Federal involvement or control for a distinct Federal purpose, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend the Forest and Rangeland Renewable Resources Planning Act of 1974 and the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 to provide that a land resource management plan or land use plan approved, amended, or revised under those Acts shall not be considered to be a continuing Federal agency action or constitute a discretionary Federal involvement or control for a distinct Federal purpose, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 549. |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 117-198. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |