US SB2556 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-196.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-196.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Federal Power Act to provide energy cybersecurity investment incentives, to establish a grant and technical assistance program for cybersecurity investments, and for other purposes.
Title
PROTECT Act of 2019 Protecting Resources On The Electric grid with Cybersecurity Technology Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-196. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 356. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Public utilities and utility rates
Rural conditions and development
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Public utilities and utility rates
Rural conditions and development