US SB2553 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 115-262.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Know the Lowest Price Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill prohibits a prescription drug plan under Medicare or Medicare Advantage from restricting a pharmacy from informing an enrollee of any difference between the price, copayment, or coinsurance of a drug under the plan and a lower price of the drug without health-insurance coverage. (Such restrictions are commonly referred to as gag clauses.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Know the Lowest Price Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-10HouseBecame Public Law No: 115-262.
2018-10-10HouseSigned by President.
2018-10-04HousePresented to President.
2018-09-28HouseCorrect Enrollment
2018-09-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8799)
2018-09-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2553.
2018-09-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8799-8801)
2018-09-25HouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2018-09-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2018-09-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-09-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-09-05HouseReceived in the House.
2018-09-05SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-09-04SenateS.Amdt.4010 Amendment SA 4010 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2018-09-04SenateS.Amdt.4010 Amendment SA 4010 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Stabenow. (consideration: CR S6033; text: CR S6033) To amend the title.
2018-09-04SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6033)
2018-09-04SenateS.Amdt.4009 Amendment SA 4009 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2018-09-04SenateS.Amdt.4009 Amendment SA 4009 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Stabenow. (consideration: CR S6033) To improve the bill.
2018-09-04SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6033)
2018-09-04SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2018-03-14SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

SB2554 (Related) 2018-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 115-263.
HB6144 (Same As) 2018-06-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6733 (Related) 2018-09-13 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
SCR49 (Related) 2018-10-02 - Without objection, the Chair laid before the House S.Con.Res. 49. The concurrent resolution was agreed to and the motion to reconsider was laid on the table. (consideration: CR H9412; text: CR H9412)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback