US SB2551 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-207.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-207.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Director of the Office of Management and Budget to establish or otherwise provide an artificial intelligence training program for the acquisition workforce, and for other purposes.
Title
AI Training Act Artificial Intelligence Training for the Acquisition Workforce Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 393 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-17 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-207. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 393 - 29 (Roll no. 464). (text: CR H8144) |
2022-09-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8272-8273) |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2551. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8144-8145) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-12-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-12-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-12-18 | Senate | S.Amdt.4896 Amendment SA 4896 proposed by Senator Schatz for Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S9308; text: CR S9308) In the nature of a substitute. |
2021-12-18 | Senate | S.Amdt.4896 Amendment SA 4896 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-12-18 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9308) |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 142. |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-40. |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7683 (Related) 2022-05-11 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.