US SB2524 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substance Use Disorder Workforce Loan Repayment Act of 2018 This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to create a loan repayment program for individuals who complete a period of service in a substance use disorder treatment job in a mental health professional shortage area or a county where the drug overdose death rate is higher than the national average. The substance use disorder treatment job must be a full-time position where the primary intent and function is the direct care of patients with or in recovery from a substance use disorder. Individuals must enter into an agreement of service of up to six years with the Health Resources and Services Administration. The repayment program shall pay one-sixth of the principal and interest on any eligible loan for each year of service; the maximum total amount of repayment by the program is $250,000 per individual.
Title
Substance Use Disorder Workforce Loan Repayment Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5102 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2524/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2524/BILLS-115s2524is.pdf |