US SB2502 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide first-time, low-level, nonviolent simple possession offenders an opportunity to expunge that conviction after successful completion of court-imposed probation
Title
Kenneth P. Thompson Begin Again Act
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Durbin without amendment. Without written report. |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1924 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 7.