US SB249 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to direct the Secretary of State to develop a strategy to regain observer status for Taiwan in the World Health Organization, and for other purposes. This bill directs the Department of State to include additional information in its annual reports concerning Taiwan's participation at the World Health Organization's World Health Assembly (WHA) as an observer. The report shall describe changes and improvements to the State Department's plan to support Taiwan's observer status at the WHA, following any meetings at which Taiwan did not participate under such status. (China has opposed Taiwan's participation, based on its position that Taiwan is part of China and not a separate country.) The State Department shall regularly report to Congress on U.S. actions and plans to strengthen Taiwan's official and unofficial diplomatic relationships around the world.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to direct the Secretary of State to develop a strategy to regain observer status for Taiwan in the World Health Organization, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-12HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-05-12HouseReceived in the House.
2020-05-12SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-05-11SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2346-2347)
2020-05-11SenateS.Amdt.1582 Amendment SA 1582 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2020-05-11SenateS.Amdt.1582 Amendment SA 1582 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Inhofe. (consideration: CR S2346-2347; text: CR S2346-2347) In the nature of a substitute.
2020-05-11SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S2346)
2020-05-11SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2345-2347)
2019-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 100.
2019-06-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2019-05-22SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-01-29SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB237 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
HB353 (Same As) 2019-01-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback