US SB2453 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 519.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 519.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides support for the conservation of North Atlantic right whales (Eubalaena glacialis). Specifically, it requires the Department of Commerce to provide financial assistance for projects designed to reduce the lethal or sub-lethal effects of human activities on such whales. In addition, Commerce must conduct surveys of plankton on an ongoing basis using a continuous plankton recorder.
Title
SAVE Right Whales Act Scientific Assistance for Very Endangered North Atlantic Right Whales Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 519. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-258. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1568 (Related) 2019-10-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 194.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Atlantic Ocean
Canada
Congressional oversight
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
International organizations and cooperation
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Atlantic Ocean
Canada
Congressional oversight
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
International organizations and cooperation
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection