US SB2436 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Healthy Forests Restoration Act of 2003 to establish emergency fireshed management areas, and for other purposes.
Title
FIRESHEDS Act Forest Improvements through Research and Emergency Stewardship for Healthy Ecosystem Development and Sustainability Act
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2021-07-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4614 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB4664 (Related) 2021-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB4664 (Related) 2021-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2436/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2436/BILLS-117s2436is.pdf |