US SB2397 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 665.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 665.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Homeland Security Data Framework Act of 2018
Title
Department of Homeland Security Data Framework Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 665. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-380. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2454 (Related) 2018-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 115-331.