US SB2390 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community College to Career Fund Act
Title
Community College to Career Fund Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5164 (Related) 2018-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB2207 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB620 (Related) 2017-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2775 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2207 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB620 (Related) 2017-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2775 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Adult education and literacy
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Labor and employment
Licensing and registrations
National Guard and reserves
Public-private cooperation
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Labor and employment
Licensing and registrations
National Guard and reserves
Public-private cooperation
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2390/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2390/BILLS-115s2390is.pdf |