US SB239 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Became Public Law No: 116-65. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Christa McAuliffe Commemorative Coin Act of 2019 (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue not more than 350,000 $1 silver coins in commemoration of Christa McAuliffe, a teacher tragically killed in the Space Shuttle Challenger Disaster. (Sec. 4) The design of the coins shall bear an image and the name of Christa McAuliffe on the obverse side and a design on the reverse side that depicts the legacy of McAuliffe as a teacher. (Sec. 5) Treasury may issue the coins from January 1-December 31, 2020. (Sec. 7) All surcharges received by Treasury from the sale of the coins shall be paid to the FIRST robotics program for the purpose of engaging and inspiring young people, through mentor-based programs, to become leaders in the fields of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Christa McAuliffe Commemorative Coin Act of 2019

Sponsors

Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY]
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI]Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM]Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY]Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN]Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC]Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA]Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR]
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA]Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO]Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS]
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI]Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA]Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY]
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK]Sen. David Perdue [R-GA]Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH]Sen. James Risch [R-ID]
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS]Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT]Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD]Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL]Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]Sen. Richard Shelby [R-AL]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK]
Sen. John Thune [R-SD]Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM]Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]Sen. Angus King [I-ME]Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA]Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA]Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA]Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA]
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR]Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ]Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY]Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ]
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX]Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-09HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-65. (TXT | PDF)
2019-10-09HouseSigned by President.
2019-09-27HousePresented to President.
2019-09-19HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-19HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7796-7797)
2019-09-19HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 239.
2019-09-19HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7796-7800)
2019-09-19HouseMs. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-07-10HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-07-10HouseReceived in the House.
2019-07-10SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-07-09SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4739)
2019-07-09SenateS.Amdt.907 Amendment SA 907 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2019-07-09SenateS.Amdt.907 Amendment SA 907 proposed by Senator Thune for Senator Shaheen. (consideration: CR S4739; text: CR S4739) To improve the bill.
2019-07-09SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4739)
2019-07-09SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2019-01-28SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB500 (Related) 2019-01-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback