US SB2381 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to review implementation of requirements regarding screening by the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) of baby formula, breast milk, purified deionized water for infants, and juice on airlines. The review shall include an assessment of whether the TSA effectively manages the consistency of the application of protocols to the screening of such products; the need for the TSA to update and revise procedures for screening such products; whether the TSA effectively tracks passenger complaints related to such screening to monitor trends and identify inconsistencies; the practices of the TSA with respect to communications and information sharing with passengers, air carriers, and airports relating to protocols for such screening; and the policies of the TSA regarding the screening of passengers with nursing products, including the extent to which such passengers are more likely to receive secondary screening. Additionally, the GAO must make recommendations for improving the practices of the TSA related to the screening of passengers with nursing products.
Title
Traveling Parents Screening Consistency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-07-30 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4597; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S4597) |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 489. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-238. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3246 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Child health
Congressional oversight
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Child health
Congressional oversight
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security