US SB2379 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Committee on Armed Services Subcommittee on Personnel. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Committee on Armed Services Subcommittee on Personnel. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military Spouse Employment Act of 2018
Title
Military Spouse Employment Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Armed Services Subcommittee on Personnel. Hearings held. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1247-1248) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3319 (Related) 2017-08-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB5125 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB5125 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2379/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2379/BILLS-115s2379is.pdf |