US SB2351 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Office of the Director of National Intelligence (ODNI) to report to Congress about the killing of Washington Post columnist Jamal Khashoggi and imposes related sanctions. The report shall present evidence about whether any current or former government official of Saudi Arabia had advanced knowledge of the killing, ordered the killing, or was involved in tampering with related evidence. It shall also list foreign persons that the ODNI has high confidence were responsible for Khashoggi's death, materially assisted in causing the death, or impeded any investigations into the death. The Department of State and the Department of Homeland Security shall bar such foreign persons from entering the United States and revoke visas belonging to such persons. The State Department shall report to Congress about the extent to which Saudi Arabia is responsible for gross violations of internationally recognized human rights and about U.S. actions to address such violations. The report shall also describe the publication by Saudi Arabia's Ministry of Education of intolerant educational materials and U.S. actions to encourage an end to the production and use of such materials.
Title
Saudi Arabia Human Rights and Accountability Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2037 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Asia
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Europe
Evidence and witnesses
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Middle East
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Religion
Sanctions
Saudi Arabia
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Turkey
Violent crime
Visas and passports
Women's rights
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Europe
Evidence and witnesses
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Middle East
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Religion
Sanctions
Saudi Arabia
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Turkey
Violent crime
Visas and passports
Women's rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2351/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2351/BILLS-116s2351is.pdf |