US SB2336 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to address the threat from the development of Iran's ballistic missile program and the transfer or deployment of Iranian missiles and related goods and technology, including materials and equipment, and for other purposes.
Title
Making Iran Sanctions Stick In Lieu of Expiration of Sanctions Act MISSILES Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Pete Ricketts [R-NE] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 372. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Cardin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3152 (Related) 2023-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB815 (Related) 2024-04-24 - Became Public Law No: 118-50.
HB815 (Related) 2024-04-24 - Became Public Law No: 118-50.