US SB2313 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defending Elections from Threats by Establishing Redlines Act of 2018 This bill requires the Office of the Director of National Intelligence (DNI), no more than 30 days after a U.S. election, to determine whether a foreign government interfered with the election and report on that determination. If the DNI reports that there was not interference and subsequently determines that there was interference, the DNI shall report on the subsequent determination. If the DNI determines that Russia interfered with an election, the President shall impose specified sanctions. The President shall brief Congress on any foreign government the President determines interfered with, or is likely to interfere with, an election.
Title
Defending Elections from Threats by Establishing Redlines Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4884 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Asia
Aviation and airports
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
China
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
European Union
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Metals
Middle East
Mining
North Korea
Oil and gas
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Railroads
Russia
Sanctions
Securities
Subversive activities
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
Aviation and airports
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
China
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
European Union
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Metals
Middle East
Mining
North Korea
Oil and gas
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Railroads
Russia
Sanctions
Securities
Subversive activities
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2313/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2313/BILLS-115s2313is.pdf |