US SB231 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-248.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-248.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency to develop guidance for firefighters and other emergency response personnel on best practices to protect them from exposure to PFAS and to limit and prevent the release of PFAS into the environment, and for other purposes.
Title
PFAS Act Protecting Firefighters from Adverse Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-01 - House - Final Passage Under Suspension of the Rules Results (Y: 400 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-248. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 22 (Roll no. 498). (text: 11/29/2022 CR H8609) |
2022-12-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8702-8703) |
2022-11-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 231. |
2022-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8609-8612) |
2022-11-29 | House | Ms. Stevens moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-07-30 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-07-30 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5189-5190) |
2021-07-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.2125 Amendment SA 2125 proposed by Senator Heinrich for Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S5190; text: CR S5190) In the nature of a substitute. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.2125 Amendment SA 2125 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5189-5190) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 55. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-21. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4954 (Related) 2021-08-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.