US SB2304 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tribal Early Childhood, Education, and Related Services Integration Act of 2015 This bill amends the Native American Programs Act of 1974 to require the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish a demonstration program to support tribal early childhood education demonstration projects. Funding for projects is through existing programs that have a purpose consistent with the purpose of the demonstration program. HHS may waive certain provisions of law, policy, or procedure related to the programs providing funding for projects. Demonstration projects must be: (1) carried out by an Indian tribe, a tribal organization, or a consortium with a tribe or tribal organization as its primary member; (2) designed around new approaches that address tribal community needs and improve early childhood education and services; and (3) focused on Native culture, culturally based early childhood education, and related services. HHS must make grants to demonstration projects to: (1) build or upgrade facilities for early childhood care and development, and (2) reimburse early childhood educators who fulfill a period of obligated service for costs associated with obtaining early childhood certification or credentials. This bill amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to revise federal student loan forgiveness and loan cancellation for teachers to increase the maximum amounts of loan forgiveness and cancellation that may be provided to early childhood teachers in programs operated by Indian tribes or serving a large percentage of Indian children. Cancellation of student loans for public service is expanded to include service in Indian prekindergarten, child care programs, or early childhood learning and development centers.
Title
Tribal Early Childhood, Education, and Related Services Integration Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-287. |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5072 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Subjects
Child care and development
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Native Americans
Preschool education
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Native Americans
Preschool education
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2304/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2304/BILLS-114s2304is.pdf |