US SB2302 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 170.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

America's Transportation Infrastructure Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

America's Transportation Infrastructure Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 170.
2019-08-01SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2019-07-30SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-07-29SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

HB831 (Related) 2019-09-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-57. (TXT | PDF)
HB879 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1166 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB1517 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1768 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
HB2052 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB2237 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB2616 (Related) 2019-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB207 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
SB349 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Held at the desk.
SB353 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB383 (Related) 2019-05-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-38.
SB563 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB654 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB747 (Related) 2019-05-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-39.
SB1098 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1211 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
SB1527 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1909 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1913 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1992 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 168.
SB2129 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2271 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2280 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2285 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB2838 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB674 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1707)
SB1546 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2310 (Related) 2019-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB4433 (Related) 2019-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB4759 (Related) 2019-10-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
HB4896 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.

Subjects

Accidents
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alaska
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Appalachian Regional Commission
Appropriations
Atmospheric science and weather
Caribbean area
Census and government statistics
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Commuting
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Economic performance and conditions
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental technology
Floods and storm protection
Food industry and services
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Housing supply and affordability
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Indian lands and resources rights
Infrastructure development
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Lighting, heating, cooling
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Motor carriers
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Natural disasters
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pedestrians and bicycling
Performance measurement
Pipelines
Public contracts and procurement
Public transit
Puerto Rico
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Small business
State and local government operations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
U.S. territories and protectorates
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback