US SB2299 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-14 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-14 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
TITLE I--IMPROVING PIPELINE SAFETY INFRASTRUCTURE This title addresses pipeline safety and infrastructure with respect to natural gas and hazardous liquid pipelines. It authorizes appropriations through FY2023 for specified pipelines safety programs under the Pipelines Safety Improvement Act of 2002 and related enactments. Among other provisions, the title requires fees for compliance reviews of liquefied natural gas (LNG) facilities; authorizes the establishment of limited safety-enhancing testing programs to evaluate innovative technologies and operation practices testing the safe operation of natural gas or hazardous liquid pipeline facilities; sets forth requirements for idled natural or other gas transmission and hazardous liquid pipelines; updates the standards for LNG facilities; establishes the National Center of Excellence for Liquefied Natural Gas Safety and Training to include a repository of information on best practices relating to LNG operations; requires advanced leak-detection technologies and practices that include a schedule for repairing or replacing each leaking pipe, except a pipe with a leak so small that it poses no potential hazard, with appropriate deadlines; directs the Department of Transportation (DOT) to finalize a rule on gas gathering lines; and allows the Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration to use the Transportation Technology Center in Pueblo, Colorado, for research and development relating to transportation safety improvements that will advance the safe and efficient transportation of hazardous materials and energy products. TITLE II--LEONEL RONDON PIPELINE SAFETY ACT Leonel Rondon Pipeline Safety Act This title addresses pipeline safety with respect to gas distribution systems. Among other provisions, the title directs DOT to require each distribution integrity plan developed by an operator of a gas distribution pipeline to include the risks from the presence of cast iron pipes and mains and risks that may result from the operation of a low-pressure distribution system; operators to establish protocols for communicating with fire, police, and other relevant public officials after a disaster that includes fires, explosions, or one or more fatalities; procedural manuals for operations, maintenance, and emergencies to include certain written procedures; operators to identify and manage traceable, reliable, and complete, records that are critical to ensuring proper pressure control for a gas distribution system; and the development of standards that promote sufficient staffing for monitoring and regulating gas pressure levels by each operator.
Title
PIPES Act of 2020 Protecting our Infrastructure of Pipelines and Enhancing Safety Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-14 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-08-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5337-5345) |
2020-08-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.2642 Amendment SA 2642 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.2642 Amendment SA 2642 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S5354; text: CR S5337-5345) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S5354) |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5348-5354) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 427. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-217. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2139 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB1097 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1097 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Colorado
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Disaster relief and insurance
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Due process and equal protection
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental technology
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Metals
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Pollution liability
Public utilities and utility rates
Research and development
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
Worker safety and health
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Colorado
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Disaster relief and insurance
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Due process and equal protection
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental technology
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Metals
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Pollution liability
Public utilities and utility rates
Research and development
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
Worker safety and health