US SB2288 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide coverage of medically necessary home resiliency services under Medicare.
Title
SAFE through Medicare Act Survival Aid For Emergencies through Medicare Act
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2764 (Related) 2024-12-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1229 (Related) 2023-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4375 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1229 (Related) 2023-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4375 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/2288/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s2288/BILLS-118s2288is.pdf |