US SB2273 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Appalachian Regional Commission through FY2025.
Title
Appalachian Regional Commission Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4434 (Same As) 2019-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Appalachian Regional Commission
Economic development
Economics and public finance
Regional and metropolitan planning
Rural conditions and development
Economic development
Economics and public finance
Regional and metropolitan planning
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2273/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2273/BILLS-116s2273is.pdf |