US SB2266 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abby Honold Act This bill directs the Department of Justice's Office on Violence Against Women to make competitive grants to law enforcement agencies and victim services organizations to implement evidence-based, trauma-informed approaches in responding to and investigating domestic violence, dating violence, sexual assault, or stalking.
Title
Abby Honold Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4720 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Sex offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Sex offenses
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2266/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2266/BILLS-115s2266is.pdf |