US SB2242 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to clarify the obligation to report acts of foreign election influence and require implementation of compliance and reporting systems by Presidential campaigns to detect and report such acts.
Title
Foreign Influence Reporting in Elections Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3873 (Related) 2019-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB1562 (Related) 2019-06-24 - S.Amdt.845 Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB4617 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HR650 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3905 (Related) 2020-06-17 - By Senator Rubio from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 116-233. Minority views filed.
SB2669 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB8363 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, Foreign Affairs, Ways and Means, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4880 (Related) 2020-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1562 (Related) 2019-06-24 - S.Amdt.845 Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB4617 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HR650 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3905 (Related) 2020-06-17 - By Senator Rubio from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 116-233. Minority views filed.
SB2669 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB8363 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, Foreign Affairs, Ways and Means, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4880 (Related) 2020-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2242/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2242/BILLS-116s2242is.pdf |