US SB2234 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to make housing affordable, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affordable HOME Act Affordable Housing Opportunities Made Equitable Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB3200 (Related) 2021-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB1632 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB5385 (Same As) 2021-09-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.

Subjects

Advisory bodies
Alternative and renewable resources
Appropriations
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing supply and affordability
Income tax credits
Indian social and development programs
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Landlord and tenant
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
Public utilities and utility rates
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Rural conditions and development
Small business
State and local government operations

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback