US SB2193 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-160. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

CHARGE Act Charging Helps Agencies Realize General Efficiencies Act This bill requires the General Services Administration to issue (1) guidance to clarify that federal agencies may use a charge card to pay to charge federal electric motor vehicles at commercial charging stations, and (2) a charge card for such payments to each agency for each of the agency's electric motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHARGE Act Charging Helps Agencies Realize General Efficiencies Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-14 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 403 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-01SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-160. (TXT | PDF)
2020-10-01SenateSigned by President.
2020-09-21SenatePresented to President.
2020-09-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-14HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 2 (Roll no. 184). (text: CR H4350)
2020-09-14HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4370-4371)
2020-09-14HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-09-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2193.
2020-09-14HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4350-4351)
2020-09-14HouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-11-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-11-26HouseReceived in the House.
2019-11-25SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-11-21SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6764; text: CR S6764)
2019-09-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 199.
2019-09-10SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-95.
2019-07-24SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2019-07-18SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB8192 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8191 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback