US SB2178 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Inspector General Recommendation Transparency Act of 2018
Title
Inspector General Recommendation Transparency Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-05-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2885; text: CR S2885) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 409. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 115-245. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations