US SB2172 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve grants, payments, and technical assistance provided by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to serve homeless veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Building Solutions for Veterans Experiencing Homelessness Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-28 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5025 (Related) 2021-09-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB6810 (Related) 2022-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB6810 (Related) 2022-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2172/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2172/BILLS-117s2172is.pdf |