US SB2159 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-220.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-220.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs located at 400 College Drive, Middleburg, Florida, as the "Andrew K. Baker Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic", and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to designate the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs located at 400 College Drive, Middleburg, Florida, as the "Andrew K. Baker Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic", and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-220. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-11-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8444) |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2159. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8444-8446) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-02-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-02-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S528) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S528) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1960 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.