US SB2158 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 270.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 270.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to extend the authorization for the Cape Cod National Seashore Advisory Commission.
Title
Cape Cod National Seashore Advisory Commission Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 270. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment. With written report No. 117-71. |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB803 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.