US SB2142 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on October 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workplace Democracy Act This bill amends the National Labor Relations Act to require the National Labor Relations Board (NLRB) to certify without an election an individual or labor organization as the exclusive representative of the employees in a unit appropriate for bargaining if a majority of the employees has signed valid authorizations designating the individual or labor organization specified in a properly filed petition as their bargaining representative and no other individual or labor organization is currently certified or recognized as the exclusive representative of any of the employees in the unit. The NLRB shall develop guidelines and procedures for the designation by employees of a bargaining representative. Deadlines are prescribed for critical turns in collective bargaining to establish an initial agreement upon the request of an individual or labor organization that has been newly organized or certified as a representative. The first meeting shall convene within 10 days after the employer receives a request. Either party to a negotiation may, 90 days after commencement, notify the Federal Mediation and Conciliation Service of the existence of a dispute and request mediation. The Service shall refer the dispute to an arbitration board if the parties are not brought to agreement within 30 days after the request for mediation.
Title
Workplace Democracy Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3690 (Same As) 2016-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2398 (Related) 2015-12-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5000 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2398 (Related) 2015-12-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5000 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
National Labor Relations Board (NLRB)
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
National Labor Relations Board (NLRB)
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2142/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2142/BILLS-114s2142is.pdf |