US SB2102 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for drought preparedness and improved water supply reliability.
Title
Water for Conservation and Farming Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3027 (Related) 2023-06-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
SB2020 (Related) 2024-12-20 - Held at the desk.
HB8428 (Related) 2024-05-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
SB2020 (Related) 2024-12-20 - Held at the desk.
HB8428 (Related) 2024-05-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/2102/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s2102/BILLS-118s2102is.pdf |