US SB2099 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Federal Land Management Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA), upon request of the city of Old Town, Maine, to convey to the city without consideration lands that: (1) were conveyed by the federal government to the city under the Bankhead-Jones Farm Tenant Act by the deed dated June 5, 1941, and (2) are proposed for conveyance for the purpose of economic development. The bill authorizes the USDA to sell or exchange 30 tracts of National Forest System land in Georgia totaling approximately 3,841 acres. The bill designates specified federal lands in the Cherokee National Forest in Tennessee as wilderness and as additions to the National Wilderness Preservation System. The bill requires specified lands in the George Washington National Forest (a part of the George Washington and Jefferson National Forests in Virginia, West Virginia, and Kentucky) to be: (1) incorporated in the Rough Mountain Wilderness, and (2) designated as a potential wilderness area for eventual incorporation in the Rich Hole Wilderness. The bill authorizes USDA to sell specified federal land in Winn Parish, Louisiana. USDA shall convey a portion of that land to Collins Camp Properties, Inc. The bill directs USDA to sell and quitclaim a parcel of real property, including improvements, located at 4500 Glenwood Drive in Riverside, California, consisting of approximately 8.75 acres and administered by the Natural Resources Conservation Service, to the Riverside Corona Resource Conservation District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Land Management Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-16SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
2017-11-16SenateCommittee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported by Senator Roberts without amendment. Without written report.
2017-11-09SenateCommittee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2017-11-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.

Same As/Similar To

HB1177 (Related) 2018-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 115-156.
HB1434 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2218 (Related) 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2941 (Related) 2017-11-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB3567 (Related) 2017-11-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB571 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB715 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB973 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1975 (Related) 2017-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6465)
SB2031 (Related) 2017-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback