US SB2087 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fort Scott National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act (Sec. 2) This bill allows the Department of the Interior to acquire by purchase with appropriated funds or by donation (as under current law) the lands and interests in land, together with buildings and improvements, known as Fort Scott in the city of Fort Scott in Bourbon County, Kansas. The proviso that the buildings so acquired shall not include the structure known as "Lunette Blair" is repealed (thereby allowing its acquisition). The boundary of the Fort Scott National Historic Site in Kansas shall be modified accordingly.
Title
Fort Scott National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 596. |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 114-323. |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |