US SB2062 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 653.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 653.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Oracle Cabins Conveyance Act of 2018 This bill directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to sell and quitclaim to a person who holds a valid permit for the use of certain National Forest System land in Arizona all right, title, and interest in and to the property for which the permittee holds such a permit. A sale of such property shall be for cash consideration equal to the property's market value, as determined by an appraisal in accordance with this bill. USDA shall pay the costs of the conveyance of any properties sold and quitclaimed under this bill.
Title
Oracle Cabins Conveyance Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 653. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 115-366. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |