US SB2053 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SAFE Act Securing America's Federal Elections Act This bill addresses election security through grant programs and requirements for voting systems and paper ballots. The bill establishes requirements for voting systems, including that systems (1) use individual, durable, voter-verified paper ballots; (2) make a voter's marked ballot available for inspection and verification by the voter before the vote is cast; (3) ensure that individuals with disabilities are given an equivalent opportunity to vote, including with privacy and independence, in a manner that produces a voter-verified paper ballot; (4) be manufactured in the United States; and (5) meet specified cybersecurity requirements, including the prohibition of the connection of a voting system to the internet. The National Science Foundation must award grants to study, test, and develop accessible voter-verified paper ballot voting and best practices to enhance the accessibility of such voting for individuals with disabilities, for voters whose primary language is not English, and for voters with difficulties in literacy. The Election Assistance Commission (EAC) must award grants to states to replace certain voting systems, carry out voting system security improvements, and implement and model best practices for ballot design, ballot instructions, and the testing of ballots. States must carry out postelection risk-limiting audits for all federal elections, funded by the EAC. States may use elections requirements payments from the EAC to carry out activities related to election security. The EAC must provide for the testing of voting system hardware and software and decertify such technology that does not meet guidelines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFE Act Securing America's Federal Elections Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Same As/Similar To

HB2722 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB2660 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1540 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2652 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2238 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback