US SB2042 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text: CR S4635)
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text: CR S4635)
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue $5 gold coins, $1 silver coins, and half-dollar clad coins emblematic of the mission of the National Purple Heart Hall of Honor. The bill limits the issuance of such coins to the one-year period beginning on January 1, 2021. The bill prescribes surcharges for coin sales, which shall be paid to the National Purple Heart Hall of Honor, Inc., to support the mission of such organization, including capital improvements to the National Purple Heart Hall of Honor facilities.
Title
National Purple Heart Hall of Honor Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text: CR S4635) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1830 (Related) 2020-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-247. (TXT | PDF)
SB2815 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2815 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
New York State
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
New York State
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2042/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2042/BILLS-116s2042is.pdf |