US SB2014 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 410.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 410.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Next Generation Researchers Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to establish the Next Generation of Researchers Initiative in the National Institutes of Health (NIH) to promote, provide, and improve opportunities for new researchers and earlier research independence. The initiative must: (1) coordinate with agencies, academic institutions, and others to improve and update existing information on the biomedical research workforce, and (2) take into consideration the recommendations of the National Academies of Sciences regarding the next generation of researchers and report on actions taken based on those recommendations. (Sec. 3) The bill revises loan repayment programs for health professionals conducting research to increase the maximum repayment amount and to give the NIH the authority to expand eligibility for the programs based on workforce and scientific priorities. The Government Accountability Office must report on NIH efforts to attract, retain, and develop emerging scientists.
Title
Next Generation Researchers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 410. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3466 (Same As) 2015-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health personnel
Medical research
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health personnel
Medical research
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding